House | 04/27/2022 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 04/18/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2022. | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | Reported favorably (10-0). | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |