LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HR227
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HR227
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2022 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR227
Action History
House
06/08/2022
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
House
06/06/2022
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
House
06/06/2022
Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
House
06/03/2022
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022.
House
06/02/2022
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
House
06/01/2022
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.