House | 05/06/2022 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 05/03/2022 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 81, nays 9. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2022. | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | Reported with amendments (12-0). | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |