House | 05/17/2022 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 05/16/2022 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/11/2022 | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 05/05/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2022. | ||
House | 05/04/2022 | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/03/2022 | Reported with amendments (9-0). | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | Reported favorably (17-0). | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |