Senate
|
06/18/2022
|
Effective date 6/18/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 676.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2022
|
Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Reported with amendments (13-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|