Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Effective date 6/3/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 256.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 5. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 5 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|