House | 05/02/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |