Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
By a vote of 92 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|