Senate | 05/10/2022 | The amended bill was read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 14 yeas and 21 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2022 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |