Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Effective date 5/24/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 82.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/20/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Reported favorably (7-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|