Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Effective date 6/16/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 502.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 55, nays 40. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Freiberg, Harris, and Huval.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Hewitt, Fields, and Talbot.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2022
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 16. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Reported favorably (6-2). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|