Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Effective date 8/1/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 504.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 83, nays 8. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
House conferees appointed: LaCombe, Gregory Miller, and Stefanski.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Peacock, Luneau, and Stine.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 77, nays 19. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Reported favorably (9-5-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|