Senate
|
06/18/2022
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 1. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Allain, Cortez, and Reese.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Bishop, Beaullieu, and Schexnayder.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Reported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|