Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Effective date 6/16/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 530.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 83, nays 4. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
Conference Committee report received on June 3 replaced with a new version received on June 5.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Smith, Connick, and Cortez.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Stefanski, Davis, and Hughes.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 7. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Reported with amendments (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 4 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|