Senate | 05/17/2022 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 18 yeas and 19 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 14 yeas and 20 nays. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |