RÉSUMÉ DIGEST ACT 699 (SB 368) 2022 Regular Session Harris Prior law prohibited the governing authority of any municipality or parish affected by Hurricane Katrina or Hurricane Rita and any agency of any such municipality or parish from allowing or causing any building or land to lose its nonconforming use status because, during all or part of the period of August 29, 2005, through August 28, 2007, as a result of damage caused by Hurricane Katrina or Hurricane Rita, it is temporarily vacant or because the operations normally carried on in such building or on such land have been temporarily discontinued, notwithstanding any contrary law or municipal or parish ordinance or resolution. Prior law provided that the governing authority of any parish having a population in excess of 400,000 may by ordinance reduce the time period provided for in prior law. New law retains prior law but changes its applicability from any building or land affected by Hurricane Katrina or Hurricane Rita to any building or land temporarily vacant or due to operations on such property being temporarily discontinued from March 11, 2020, through March 16, 2022, and authorizes the governing authority of a parish having a population in excess of 350,000 to reduce the time period. Effective June 18, 2022. (Amends R.S. 33:4882)