Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
Effective date 8/1/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 423.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Reported favorably (9-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|