Senate
|
06/18/2022
|
Effective date 6/18/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 702.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 3. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Reported with amendments (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|