Senate
|
06/18/2022
|
Effective date 6/18/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 704.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|