Senate
|
06/18/2022
|
Effective date 8/1/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 754.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2022
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2022
|
Reported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Reported with amendments (10-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|