SLS 22RS-217 ORIGINAL 2022 Regular Session SENATE BILL NO. 42 BY SENATOR WARD SUNSET LAW. Re-creates Department of Economic Development. (6/30/22) 1 AN ACT 2 To enact R.S. 49:191(13)(a) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(10)(e), relative to the Department of 3 Economic Development, including provisions to provide for the re-creation of the 4 Department of Economic Development and the statutory entities made a part of the 5 department by law; to provide for the effective termination date for all statutory 6 authority for the existence of such statutory entities; and to provide for related 7 matters. 8 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 9 Section 1. Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of Economic Development and 10 the statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created effective June 11 30, 2022, and all statutory authority therefore is continued in accordance with the provisions 12 of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950. 13 Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of Economic 14 Development and the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created by 15 Section 1 of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2027, pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However the 16 Department of Economic Development may be re-created prior to such date in accordance 17 with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of Page 1 of 3 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 42 SLS 22RS-217 ORIGINAL 1 1950. 2 Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that 3 those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act. 4 Section 4. R.S. 49:191(13)(a) is hereby enacted to read as follows: 5 ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase- 6 out period for statutory entities; table of dates 7 Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the 8 legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their 9 operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority 10 for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of 11 July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date: 12 * * * 13 (13) July 1, 2026: 14 (a) The Department of Economic Development and all statutory entities 15 made a part of the department by law. 16 Section 5. R.S. 49:191(10)(e) is hereby repealed in its entirety. 17 Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2022; if vetoed by the 18 governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on 19 June 30, 2022, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later. The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Xavier I. Alexander. DIGEST SB 42 Original 2022 Regular Session Ward Present law (Sunset law) provides that the Dept. of Economic Development and all the statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations as of July 1, 2022, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2023, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto. Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Economic Development and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2022, for a four-year period. Supersedes the provisions of the "Sunset" law that set out the procedure for review and re-creation and that require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along with additional provisions. Page 2 of 3 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 42 SLS 22RS-217 ORIGINAL Effective June 30, 2022. (Adds R.S. 49:191(13)(a); repeals R.S. 49:191(10)(e)) Page 3 of 3 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions.