Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Effective date 8/1/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Becomes Act No. 283 without the Governor's signature.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 6 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 21. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Reported favorably (7-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 6 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|