Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Effective date 5/25/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 125.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/20/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 22. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Reported favorably (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 3 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|