Senate
|
06/18/2022
|
Effective date 6/18/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 760.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2022
|
Discharged from the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2022
|
Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2022
|
Reported with amendments (14-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|