House | 05/26/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 05/25/2022 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2022 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2022 | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2022 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2022 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |