Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Effective date 6/16/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 507.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 76, nays 9. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice the Senate recommitted the bill to Conference committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read; recommited to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
The vote by which the Conference Committee Report was adopted was reconsidered.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Milligan, Hewitt, and Cortez.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Zeringue, Stefanski, and Schexnayder.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 5. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Reported with amendments (19-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Reported with amendments (10-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|