Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
Effective date 8/1/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 410.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|