Senate
|
06/18/2022
|
Effective date 6/18/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 661.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2022
|
Reported favorably (7-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|