Senate
|
06/18/2022
|
Effective date 1/1/2023.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 662.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2022
|
Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2022
|
Reported favorably (10-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered re- reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2022
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2022
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|