Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
Effective date 8/1/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 411.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Reported favorably (10-0-1). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|