House | 05/25/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 05/24/2022 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2022 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 12 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2022 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |