Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Effective date 5/31/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 180.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Reported favorably (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|