Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Discharged from Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice the House discharged the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Notice of Senate concurring in House amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Notice Senate discharged from Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
The vote by which the amendment(s) were rejected was reconsidered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
Senate Conference Committee members discharged.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Foil, Milligan, and Smith.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Stagni, Stefanski, and Deshotel.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2022
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2022
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Reported with amendments (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|