Senate | 05/02/2022 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/28/2022. | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 04/21/2022 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |