Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 95 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Reported favorably (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|