Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 95 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|