House | 05/31/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | ||
House | 05/26/2022 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | ||
House | 05/26/2022 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2022 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2022 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2022 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |