Senate | 06/03/2022 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 06/03/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2022 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2022 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 06/01/2022 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 95 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 05/31/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2022. | ||
House | 05/31/2022 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/31/2022 | Discharged from the Committee on Commerce. | ||
House | 05/23/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | ||
House | 05/19/2022 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | ||
House | 05/19/2022 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2022 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2022 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |