Senate | 06/06/2022 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2022 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2022. | ||
House | 06/06/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2022 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 06/06/2022 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 101 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 06/03/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022. | ||
House | 06/03/2022 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/02/2022 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | ||
House | 06/02/2022 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2022 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2022 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |