LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR168
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SR168
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2022 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR168
Action History
Senate
06/06/2022
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
Senate
06/03/2022
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted.
Senate
06/02/2022
Reported with amendments.
Senate
05/31/2022
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.