Senate | 05/26/2022 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2022 | Read by title and adopted. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2022 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |