House
|
06/27/2023
|
Effective date: 08/01/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 422.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
By a vote of 22 yeas and 14 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 15. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported with amendments (7-3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/17/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|