House
|
05/23/2023
|
Effective date: 08/01/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 3.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported with amendments (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/17/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|