House
|
07/18/2023
|
Notice Senate failed to override the veto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
By a vote of 23 yeas and 15 nays, the motion to override the Governor's veto failed to be adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
By a vote of 24 yeas and 14 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Notice House voted to override the Governor's veto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Veto message from the Governor received and read.
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Veto message read, roll called on final consideration, 72 yeas, 25 nays. Veto overridden by two-thirds vote of the elected members.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 8 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
By a vote of 87 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Reported with amendments (18-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/17/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|