Senate
|
06/04/2023
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 21. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Reported favorably (8-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/24/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|