Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 31. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported favorably (8-3-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/24/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|