Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 37. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported favorably (7-3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/24/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|