House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 20, nays 47. Failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/24/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|