House | 05/15/2023 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/2023. | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2023. | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2023. | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Reported favorably (10-0). | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Prefiled. |