House | 05/23/2023 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 27, nays 68. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2023. | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Reported with amendments (5-4). | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Prefiled. |